FRIENDS OF PARSON'S HEATH CHURCH OF ENGLAND PRIMARY SCHOOL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides funds for educational purposes which benefit the Parsons Heath Primary school community
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Essex
Governance
- 26 November 1984: Standard registration
- 01 April 2015: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- PARSONS HEATH SCHOOL PARENT - TEACHER ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2009 | 30/11/2010 | 30/11/2011 | 30/11/2012 | 30/11/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.46k | £7.60k | £3.56k | £6.64k | £7.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.02k | £6.39k | £4.53k | £4.58k | £9.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2013 | 05 May 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2012 | 03 April 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2011 | 23 July 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2011 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 2ND OCTOBER 1984
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL AND TO FOSTER MORE EXTENDED RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL, ALSO TO ENGAGE IN ACTIVITIES WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS ATTENDING IT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window