SAINT MICHAEL'S CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL (TANKARDS CLOSE)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Charitable Activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bath And North East Somerset
- Bristol City
- North Somerset
- South Gloucestershire
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 03 December 1984: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BRISTOL DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £239 | £244 | £251 | £259 | £266 | |
|
Total expenditure | £239 | £244 | £251 | £259 | £266 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 194 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 194 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 560 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 560 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 01 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 28 JUNE 1967
Charitable objects
THE PURCHASE OF A SITE FOR, OR THE ERECTION, IMPROVEMENT OR ENLARGEMENT OF, ANY SCHOOL WHICH IS, OR IS TO BE, MAINTAINED AS A VOLUNTARY OR SPECIAL AGREEMENT SCHOOL IN THE DIOCESE OF BRISTOL IN WHICH INSTRUCTION IS, OR IS TO BE, GIVEN IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND AND THE MAINTENACE THEREOF.
Area of benefit
DIOCESE OF BRISTOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
HILLSIDE HOUSE
1500 PARKWAY NORTH
STOKE GIFFORD
BRISTOL
BS34 8YU
- Phone:
- 01179060100
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window