SOUTH WOODHAM FERRERS MALE VOICE CHOIR

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity performs publicly under the name "MEN2SING" and undertakes to maintian male choral singing. "MEN2SING" supports local charities by the production of concerts.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Essex
- Kent
- Surrey
Governance
- 31 October 1984: Standard registration
- MEN2SING (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Haydn Price | Chair | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Lachlan Munn | Trustee | 15 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Mead | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Richard Bull-Domican | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Richard Sowerby | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Brian Griffiths | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Ivan Lambert | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|||||
John Wallace | Trustee | 01 April 2010 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.66k | £14.25k | £20.21k | £17.64k | £19.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.46k | £12.45k | £18.87k | £17.08k | £21.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 26 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1ST APRIL 1983 AS AMENDED 28TH SEPTEMBER 1984 AND 13TH APRIL 1987 as amended on 19 Mar 2019
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN AND APPRECIATION OF THE ART AND SCIENCE OF CHORAL MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CHORAL CONCERTS AND BY SUCH OTHER WAYS AS THE CHOIR, THROUGH ITS COMMITTEE, SHALL DETERMINE FROM TIME TO TIME.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 King Edwards Road
South Woodham Ferrers
CHELMSFORD
CM3 5PQ
- Phone:
- 01245321108
- Email:
- chairman@men2sing.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window