THE MEPAL OUTDOOR CENTRE CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of affordable outdoor leisure, coaching and vocational training for everyone, regardless of age or ability.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 26 November 1984: Standard registration
- 26 August 2014: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 26 August 2014: Funds transferred to 1154890 MEPAL OUTDOOR CENTRE
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2009 | 31/10/2010 | 31/10/2011 | 31/10/2012 | 31/10/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £341.68k | £357.01k | £356.30k | £292.23k | £210.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £381.84k | £361.56k | £399.69k | £371.25k | £264.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2013 | 20 August 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2013 | 20 August 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 October 2012 | 05 April 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2012 | 05 April 2013 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 October 2011 | 16 July 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2011 | 16 July 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 October 2010 | 02 August 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2010 | 02 August 2011 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 6TH JUNE 1984 AS AMENDED 6TH NOVEMBER 1984, 20TH NOVEMBER 1991, 5TH FEBRUARY 1992, 24TH FEBRUARY 1993 AND 11TH MARCH 1998.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF MEPAL AND NEIGHBOURHOOD BY PROVIDING FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS AND IN PARTICULAR TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR SAILING CANOEING BOARD SAILING AND SUCH OTHER RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE AT THE MEPAL OUTDOOR CENTRE, IRETON'S WAY, MEPAL IN THE COUNTY OF CAMBRIDGESHIRE.
Area of benefit
MEPAL AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window