Accounts and annual returns BURWELL MUSEUM TRUST

Charity number: 290431
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 28 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 28 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 09 February 2024 101 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 09 February 2024 101 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2021 24 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 24 August 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2020 01 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 01 August 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2019 01 September 2020 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 01 September 2020 1 days late