Financial history BURWELL MUSEUM TRUST

Charity number: 290431
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £23.36k £84.87k £23.21k £64.94k £18.19k
Total expenditure £40.51k £30.43k £50.56k £47.29k £43.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £25.00k £14.74k £4.80k N/A