EALING ARTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Ealing Arts is an association of Societies and Clubs, both for amateur and professional, who have a common interest in the Arts and in arts activities in the London Borough of Ealing.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Ealing
Governance
- 26 October 1984: Standard registration
- 05 June 2014: Funds received from 295134 WEST LONDON OPERA
- EALING ARTS + LEISURE (Working name)
- EALING ARTS COUNCIL (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GILLIAN LESLEY ROWLEY | Chair | 14 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Richard Kenneth Partridge | Trustee | 11 July 2018 |
|
|||||
Colin Easton | Trustee | 04 October 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.67k | £3.15k | £4.62k | £6.07k | £6.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.28k | £1.96k | £5.51k | £6.28k | £6.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AMENDED 22 SEPTEMBER 1984 FURTHER AMENDED 22 JUNE 1999 AND 4 JULY 2000 AS AMENDED ON 16 SEP 2016
Charitable objects
TO FOSTER AND PROMOTE THE MAINTENANCE IMPROVEMENT AND DEVELOPMENT OF ARTISTIC TASTE AND THE KNOWLEDGE, UNDERSTANDING AND APPRECIATION OF THE ARTS AMONG THE INHABITANTS OF THE LONDON BOROUGH OF EALING.
Area of benefit
EALING
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 SAWYERS LAWN
LONDON
W13 0JP
- Phone:
- 02089984031
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window