IBM UNITED KINGDOM TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The activities are, through the use and understanding of information technology to: - seek the advancement of education - seek the advancement of research - improve the condition of life for the disadvantaged or disabled - support the relief of poverty - support for disaster relief efforts
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Austria
- Belgium
- Egypt
- France
- Germany
- Kenya
- Netherlands
- Spain
- Sweden
- Turkey
Governance
- 29 October 1984: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Douglas Bryan Berry | Trustee | 04 April 2018 |
|
|||||
Juliet Upton | Trustee | 04 April 2018 |
|
|||||
Kuljit Takhar | Trustee | 04 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR DEREK BELL | Trustee |
|
||||||
NAOMI JULIET HILL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANNE WOLFE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.15m | £145.00k | £197.00k | £95.00k | £126.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.53m | £549.00k | £768.00k | £2.94m | £58.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £2.11m | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £39.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.44m | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £11.29k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £1.43m | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £89.72k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | |||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | |||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | |||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | |||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 19TH OCTOBER 1984 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS ON 20TH MARCH 1986, 19TH MARCH 1987 AND 27TH JUNE 1996
Charitable objects
(A) ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF YOUNG PERSONS AND ADULTS AT UNIVERSITIES, SCHOOLS OR OTHER EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENTS IN GENERAL AND IN PARTICULAR IN THE USE AND UNDERSTANDING OF COMPUTERS, MICROPROCESSORS AND OTHER RELATED ELECTRONIC AND MECHANICAL EQUIPMENT. (B) ADVANCE RESEARCH OF EDUCATIONAL VALUE AND RESEARCH AT UNIVERSITIES OR OTHER EDUCATIONAL INSTITUTIONS IN GENERAL AND IN PARTICULAR INTO, AND INTO FIELDS OF KNOWLEDGE HAVING A BEARING OR POSSIBLE BEARING ON THE UNDERSTANDING, DEVELOPMENT OR APPLICATION OF COMPUTERS, MICROPROCESSORS AND OTHER RELATED ELECTRONIC OR MECHANICAL EQUIPMENT OR THE USE THEREOF AND TO PROMOTE THE DISSEMINATION AMONG MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC OF ANY USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH. (C) ENCOURAGE AND PROMOTE THE USE AND UNDERSTANDING OF COMPUTES, MICROPROCESSORS AND OTHER RELATED ELECTRONIC OR MECHANICAL EQUIPMENT BY ANY CHARITABLE COMPANIES, INSTITUTIONS, SOCIETIES, ASSOCIATIONS OR BODIES OR OTHERWISE IN FURTHERANCE OF EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES. (D) ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF CHILDREN, YOUNG PERSONS AN ADULTS IN GENERAL AND IN PARTICULAR BY THE DEVELOPMENT, IMPLEMENTATION AND DISSEMINATION OF TECHNOLOGY-BASED SOLUTIONS. (E) ENCOURAGE, PROMOTE AND EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE FINE ARTS INCLUDING DRAMA, MUSIC, OPERA, BALLET, DRAWING, PAINTING AND SCULPTURE AND TO ADVANCE THE STUDY THEREOF IN SCHOOLS, UNIVERSITIES AND OTHER EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENTS. (F) PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SUFFERING, HARDSHIP, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 3 OF MEMORANDUM OF ASSOCIATION)
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Interpath Advisory
130 St. Vincent Street
GLASGOW
G2 5HF
- Phone:
- 0203 989 2943
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window