SRI GURU RAVIDASS SABHA (MEDWAY)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO ADVANCE AND SPREAD THE RAVIDASSIA FAITH BY: ENCOURAGING THE COMMUNITY TO STRICTLY FOLLOW THE TEACHINGS AND PHILOSOPHY OF SHRI GURU RAVIDASS JI; UNDERTAKING TO PUBLISH AND CIRCULATE LITERATURE ON THE LIFE, TEACHINGS AND PHILOSOPHY OF SHRI GURU RAVIDASS JI AN SUPPORT PUBLICATIONS WHICH PUBLISH AND CIRCULATE LITERATURE ON THE LIFE TEACHING OF SHRI GURU RAVIDASS JI.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Medway
Governance
- 08 November 1984: Standard registration
- SHRI GURU RAVIDASS TEMPLE OF MEDWAY (Previous name)
- SIRI GURU RAVIDASS TEMPLE OF MEDWAY (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HARJINDER KUMAR BAGHA | Trustee | 15 June 2010 |
|
|
||||
NIRMAL SINGH BUNGER Custodial | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £47.31k | £42.77k | £45.47k | £63.47k | £60.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £41.59k | £30.74k | £24.28k | £40.34k | £44.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 14 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 15 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 14 September 2024 | 319 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 14 September 2024 | 319 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 September 2024 | 684 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 15 August 2024 | 654 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 November 2021 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 10 November 2021 | 10 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 05 November 2020 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 05 November 2020 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28 JULY 1984 AMENDED 11 MAY 2004
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE AND SPREAD THE RAVIDASSIA FAITH BY: ENCOURAGING THE COMMUNITY TO STRICTLY FOLLOW THE TEACHINGS AND PHILOSOPHY OF SHRI GURU RAVIDASS JI; UNDERTAKING TO PUBLISH AND CIRCULATE LITERATURE ON THE LIFE, TEACHINGS AND PHILOSOPHY OF SHRI GURU RAVIDASS JI AN SUPPORT PUBLICATIONS WHICH PUBLISH AND CIRCULATE LITERATURE ON THE LIFE TEACHING OF SHRI GURU RAVIDASS JI; HOLDING CONFERENCES, SEMINARS AND SIMILAR EVENTS IN WHICH MANY SCHOLARS AND RESEARCHERS ARE INVOLVED; DIRECTING YOUNG GENERATION TO UNDERSTAND AND FOLLOW CUSTOMS AND TRADITIONS OF THE RAVIDASSIA COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED (IN PRACTICE MEDWAY)
Contact information
- Address:
-
SRI GURU RAVIDASS SABHA
VICARAGE ROAD
STROOD
ROCHESTER
KENT
ME2 4DG
- Phone:
- 07784298027
- Email:
- ravidassiamedway@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window