ANIMAL RESCUE CENTRE

Charity Number: 290477
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Information on the charity's activities is not available.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 29 February 2004

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Animals
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
No information available
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 17 December 1984: Standard registration
  • 09 December 2008: Removed (Does not operate)
Organisation type:
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2004
Total gross income £0
Total expenditure £0
Income from government contracts N/A
Income from government grants N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 28 February 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 28 February 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2006 Not submitted
Annual return 28 February 2005 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2005 Not submitted
Annual return 29 February 2004 30 September 2004 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2004 Not Required