Accounts and annual returns NEWHAM MUSLIM CITIZENS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 290485
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 25 April 2025 84 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 25 April 2025 450 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 18 March 2023 46 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 08 March 2022 36 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 05 February 2021 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required