Financial history EASTER COMPTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 290501
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £23.54k £8.76k £26.63k £26.18k £38.77k
Total expenditure £13.40k £11.61k £22.66k £20.20k £39.30k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k N/A N/A £1.00k N/A