Financial history MAYBRIDGE KEYSTONE CLUB

Charity Number: 290520
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £34.58k £44.63k £44.01k £46.53k £43.49k
Total expenditure £28.24k £35.98k £33.99k £42.55k £46.26k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A