MAYBRIDGE KEYSTONE CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Structured and informal Youth activities for 8- 12 yr olds ,and 12 - 19 yrs olds evening. Children's activities including Alternative School provision, adult activities e.g Healthy exercise, Pilates, Short Mat Bowls Inclusive meeting place for the local community Sussex Autism, Breathing Spaces, Sussex Community Transport, children with additional needs . Chatty Cafe and Young Carers
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- West Sussex
Governance
- 06 November 1984: Standard registration
- MAYBRIDGE BOYS' CLUB (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBIN ROGERS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
SHIRLEY ROBINSON - VINEY | Trustee | 25 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kingsley HARTE | Trustee | 30 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Myra Jasper | Trustee | 08 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Gunner A.C.I.I. | Trustee | 14 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
TREVOR ENGLAND | Trustee | 18 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
CLLR HAZEL I THORPE MA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £34.58k | £44.63k | £44.01k | £46.53k | £43.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.24k | £35.98k | £33.99k | £42.55k | £46.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 15 December 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2020
(These accounts |
08 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11TH JUNE 1980, AS AMENDED 21ST JULY 1994 AS AMENDED 9 SEPTEMBER 2010
Charitable objects
TO HELP EDUCATE YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH THEIR LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES; TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, EMOTIONAL, SOCIAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES AND GENERAL WELL BEING SO THAT THEY MAY HAVE THE OPPORTUNITY TO MATURE INTO WELL INFORMED INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
51 High Street
Tarring
Worthing
BN14 7NR
- Phone:
- 01903201299
- Email:
- information.mkc@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window