ST EDMUND'S CATHOLIC PRIMARY SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Parent and staff association, raising funds for the benefit of St Edmund's Catholic Primary School.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Surrey
Governance
- 16 November 1984: Standard registration
- ST EDMUND'S CATHOLIC FIRST SCHOOL ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mary Walsh | Trustee | 04 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Louise Parker | Trustee | 04 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rudo Rumveye | Trustee | 04 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Higgins | Trustee | 05 September 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.43k | £5.67k | £13.26k | £8.93k | £9.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.48k | £6.55k | £16.04k | £5.37k | £2.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 18 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 04 June 2024 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 15 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 28 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 15 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 16 NOV 1983 AS AMENDED ON 16 NOV 2016 as amended on 12 Oct 2018
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
CATCHMENT AREA OF THE SCHOOL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Edmunds RC Primary School
The Drive
Godalming
GU7 1PF
- Phone:
- 01483414497
- Email:
- stedmundspsachair@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window