THE PRATT GREEN TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The support of hymnody by way of prizes, scholarships, bursaries, and other grants to musicians concerned with the composition and rendering of religious music and for hymn writers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 March 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 22 July 1985: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Gillian Warson | Trustee | 04 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Michael Garland | Trustee | 07 May 2019 |
|
|||||
Rev GRAHAM JAMES ADAMS LLB,BA,PHD | Trustee | 14 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
REVD DR JANET WOOTTON | Trustee | 16 October 2003 |
|
|||||
REV DR ANDREW EDWARD PRATT BSC MSC | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BERNADETTE FARRELL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/03/2019 | 29/03/2020 | 29/03/2021 | 29/03/2022 | 29/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £39.88k | £36.35k | £29.35k | £24.88k | £36.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £42.93k | £32.82k | £25.82k | £19.24k | £16.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 119 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 119 days | |
Annual return | 29 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 March 2020 | 04 February 2021 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 March 2020 | 04 February 2021 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 30TH MARCH 1984 AS AMENDED BY DEED OF VARIATION DATED 31ST OCTOBER 1984
Charitable objects
I. TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN THE FIELD OF CHURCH MUSIC AND OTHER MUSIC SUITABLE FOR RELIGIOUS PURPOSES AND IN THE FIELD OF HYMNODY. II. TO PROVIDE PRIZES SCHOLARSHIPS BURSERIES AND OTHER GRANTS FOR CHURCH MUSICIANS AND MUSICIANS CONCERNED WITH THE COMPOSITION AND RENDERING OF RELIGIOUS MUSIC AND FOR HYMN WRITERS. III. TO MAKE DONATIONS TO (II) OR OTHERWISE FURTHER THE OBJECTS OF OTHER CHARITIES CARRYING ON IN WHOLE OR IN PART OBJECTS SIMILAR TO THE OBJECTS SET OUT IN SUB-CLAUSE (I) AND (II) ABOVE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 Whimbrel Road
Quedgeley
GLOUCESTER
GL2 4LJ
- Phone:
- 07974066929
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window