CERDIC LODGE NO 7030 MASONIC CHARITIES ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supporting Masonic charities in province of "Hampshire & Isle of Wight". Supporting Masonic charities nationally "Grand Lodge of England-Wales". Donations to some named charitable institutions. Projects for childrens activities & care of the elderly, hospices & hospital appeals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Bournemouth
- Dorset
- Hampshire
- Isle Of Wight
- Poole
Governance
- 13 November 1984: Standard registration
- CERDIC LODGE BENEVOLENT FUND (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR BOB DAVIS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Stephen Madden | Trustee | 06 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul Bishop | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rodney Green | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £353 | £8.21k | £1 | £10 | £24 | |
|
Total expenditure | £475 | £8.72k | £1.00k | £7 | £1.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 10 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 04 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 06 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 12 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 07 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECCLARATION OF TRUST DATEDD 9TH JUNE 1983
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SUCH POOR AND DISTRESSED BROTHER MASONS OR THEIR POOR AND DISTRESSED WIDOWS AND CHILDREN OR TO OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH MASONIC CHARITIES OR OTHER CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS SOCIETIES AND OBJECTS AS THE LODGE SHALL IN DULY CONSTITUTED MEETING FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
43 METHUEN ROAD
BOURNEMOUTH
BH8 8ND
- Phone:
- 01202267554
- Email:
- petermartin@pdmsystems.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window