CHARITY FOR ECCLESIASTICAL AND OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support given to Gt Glemham people and organisations in Gt Glemham for educational and general purposes
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Suffolk
Governance
- 30 November 1984: Standard registration
- GREAT GLEMHAM CHURCH SCHOOL TRUST (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NICOLA GUERECA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DUNCAN MCIVER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.09k | £1.15k | £1.01k | £1.13k | £1.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £930 | £730 | £480 | £1.34k | £1.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 15 April 2024 | 70 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 23 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 08 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 23 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 10TH DECEMBER 1982
Charitable objects
FOR ANY CHARITABLE (INCLUDING EDUCATIONAL) PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF GREAT GLEMHAM OR ANY PART THEREOF AND THE BENEFIT OF MEMBERS OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND.
Area of benefit
ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF GREAT GLEMHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
DOMUS RURI
LOW ROAD
GREAT GLEMHAM
SAXMUNDHAM
IP17 2DH
- Phone:
- 01728663699
- Email:
- jillpascoe@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window