FRIENDS OF HARVARD UNIVERSITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of assistance to UK taxpayer donors interested in supporting the activities of Harvard University and its various subdivisions as well as other activities related to education
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 16 November 1984: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN HOWARD MCFADDEN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
JOSEPH HUGH O'REGAN | Trustee | 31 January 2019 |
|
|||||
James Victor Baker | Trustee | 31 January 2019 |
|
|||||
Richard Grant Howells | Trustee | 31 January 2019 |
|
|||||
Cecil Dyer Quillen | Trustee | 31 January 2019 |
|
|||||
Caroline Wright | Trustee | 31 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
JOHN DUDLEY FISHBURN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.05m | £784.34k | £5.51m | £1.02m | £458.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.16m | £898.15k | £2.85m | £3.25m | £534.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.05m | £784.34k | £5.51m | £1.02m | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.16m | £896.30k | £2.85m | £3.25m | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £1.65k | £1.86k | £1.16k | £726 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £23.76k | £24.18k | £42.09k | £43.88k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £1.13m | £872.12k | £2.81m | £3.21m | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 04 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 04 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 25TH OCTOBER 1984 as amended on 31 Jan 2019
Charitable objects
FOR THE ADVANCEMENT AND PROMOTION OF EDUCATION AND IN PARTICULAR FOR ANY EDUCATIONAL AND CHARITABLE PURPOSES CONNECTED WITH HARVARD UNIVERSITY ITS PAST AND PRESENT STUDENTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O CDS
1 MULGRAVE CHAMBERS
26-28 MULGRAVE ROAD
SUTTON
SURREY
SM2 6LE
- Phone:
- 02086423077
- Email:
- sandra@sfernandes.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window