Governing document CHRIST APOSTOLIC CHURCH GREAT BRITAIN HEADQUARTERS
Charity number: 290611

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 MAR 1981 AS AMENDED ON 01 OCT 1986 AS AMENDED ON 05 DEC 1987 AS AMENDED ON 09 APR 2017 as amended on 13 Nov 2021
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TEACHING OF THE HOLY BIBLE, THE TENETS AND PRACTICE OF THE CHRIST APOSTOLIC CHURCH.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.