TRUST PROPERTY IN CONNECTION WITH THE UKRANIAN AUTOCEPHALOUS ORTHODOX CHURCH IN GREAT BRITAIN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Property in connection with the Ukrainian Autocephalous Orthodox Church in Great Britain
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2020
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 04 December 1984: Standard registration
- TRUST PROPERTY IN CONNECTION WITH THE UKRANIAN AUTOCEPHALOUS CHURCH DIOCESE IN GREAT BRITAIN (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev BOHDAN MATWIJCZUK FFA | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Volodymyr Muzyczka | Trustee | 31 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
WASYL HUTORNY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROMAN MOROZIUK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANDREW IWANIUK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LYDIA PRICE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JAMES BEVAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAUL GENIO MAKSYMUK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
YURI BENDER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.93k | £11.31k | £12.09k | £6.52k | £1.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.53k | £7.80k | £17.17k | £5.26k | £7.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 198 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 198 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 564 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 564 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 929 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 929 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 12 April 2021 | 163 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 30TH OCTOBER 1984
Charitable objects
FOR THE CHARITABLE PURPOSES OF THE UKRAINIAN AUTOCEPHALOUS ORTHODOX CHURCH DIOCESE IN GREAT BRITAIN.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
28 SHAWCLOUGH WAY
HEALEY
ROCHDALE
LANCASHIRE
OL12 7HF
- Phone:
- 07957 236755
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window