Trustees NORTH DEVON DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 290640
Charity reporting is overdue by 465 days

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Daniel Smith Chair 13 July 2023
None on record
Norman Rider Trustee 12 September 2024
None on record
Phil Gladwin Trustee 13 July 2023
None on record
Matthew Cole Trustee 13 July 2023
None on record
Matthew Lavercombe Trustee 22 September 2022
None on record
Alison Homa Trustee 13 July 2018
None on record
Mark Etheridge Trustee 20 July 2016
1ST NORTH DEVON SCOUT GROUP
Received: On time