EASTERN EUROPEAN OUTREACH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Financial and Christian help to needy people in Eastern Europe and throughout the World. Provide UK residents opportunity to donate to help the needy
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Albania
- Bulgaria
- Macedonia
- Moldova
- Pakistan
- Romania
- Ukraine
Governance
- 23 November 1984: Standard registration
- EEO (Working name)
- EEO UK (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David John McSween | Trustee | 26 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
MATTHIAS VAN DER WEIDE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HELEN MARGARET JESZE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DOUGLAS IAN GRAHAM | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.51k | £18.57k | £10.18k | £23.20k | £10.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.24k | £10.42k | £15.10k | £20.89k | £14.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 26 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 November 2020 | 23 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 15 MAY 2002
Charitable objects
TO PROPAGATE THE GOSPEL OF JESUS CHRIST TO THE WHOLE CREATION EMPHASISING THE PROMOTION OF THE GOSPEL IN EASTERN EUROPE AND TO REFUGEES THROUGHOUT THE WORLD AND TO MATERIALLY AND FINANCIALLY HELP NEEDY PERSONS WHO ARE PERSECUTED FOR HOLDING THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN EASTERN EUROPE AND THROUGHOUT THE WORLD. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE DECLARATION DATED 3 NOVEMBER 1984)
Area of benefit
EASTERN EUROPE AND THROUGHOUT THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
16 ATHERFIELD GARDENS
EASTWOOD
NOTTINGHAM
NG16 3BZ
- Phone:
- 01773761636
- Email:
- CONTACTEEOUK@GMAIL.COM
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window