Trustees THE BRITISH INSTITUTE OF FLORENCE
Charity number: 290647

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher NR Prentice CMG | Chair | 10 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Marco Lombardi | Trustee | 01 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Shalina Ganatra | Trustee | 01 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Zock | Trustee | 01 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tessa Capponi | Trustee | 01 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Farrell | Trustee | 01 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robin Anthony Mason | Trustee | 11 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gilbert Luke Syson | Trustee | 11 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Edward Llewellyn OBE, PC | Trustee | 07 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lady Hannah Lowy Mitchell | Trustee | 28 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
James Stewart | Trustee | 25 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Maria Grazia Antoci | Trustee | 05 October 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.