Trustees U3A SAFFRON WALDEN
Charity number: 290670

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Matthews | Trustee | 09 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Bewick | Trustee | 09 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mary Curtis | Trustee | 05 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Margaret Brown | Trustee | 05 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Messenger | Trustee | 21 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
JOHN TRUEMAN | Trustee | 03 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
JAMES DWYER | Trustee | 21 November 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.