TOIBA ESTHER TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity distributes funds to aid general poverty with particular focus on facilitating adherence to traditions of Jewish religious wedding ceremonies
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 03 December 1984: Standard registration
- KEREN REB ELAZAR (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SUSAN VORHAND | Trustee | 05 June 2013 |
|
|
||||||
MICHELLE VORHAND | Trustee | 05 June 2013 |
|
|
||||||
BARRY BODNER | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.60k | £20.06k | £3.16k | £26.45k | £9.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.74k | £9.78k | £20.64k | £21.79k | £1.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 10 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 10 February 2025 | 347 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 10 February 2025 | 347 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 08 March 2022 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 29/10/1984 AS AMENDED ON 15/03/2013
Charitable objects
I) BY SUCH MEANS AS ARE RECOGNISED BY ENGLISH LAW AS CHARITABLE TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN AND THE RELIGION OF ORTHODOX JEWISH FAITH; II) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY; AND III) SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS ARE RECOGNISED BY ENGLISH LAW AS CHARITABLE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
23 ELMCROFT AVENUE
LONDON
NW11 0RS
- Phone:
- 02076094181
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window