HIGHGATE NEWTOWN COMMUNITY PARTNERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We work with all ages: provide facilities for sports & wellbeing, opportunities for arts & crafts sessions,activities for children, young people & community support. Core projects: community lunch club, free exercise & pottery for over 60s, dementia cafe, crisis food parcels, free activities for under 5s, community events, art programmes for all ages, after school activities including woodwork
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £156,374 from 4 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Camden
- Haringey
- Islington
Governance
- 16 January 1985: Standard registration
- HIGHGATE NEWTOWN COMMUNITY CENTRE LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBERT GEORGE SEYMOUR AITKEN | Chair | 04 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Treen | Trustee | 12 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Roy Hill | Trustee | 12 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Olutomi Ayodeji | Trustee | 11 December 2020 |
|
|||||
Phillip J Whale | Trustee | 29 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Robert Leonard Schon | Trustee | 04 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Father Damien D R Mason | Trustee | 19 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Murley Garfield Hodge | Trustee | 04 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
Rev Andrew John Bruce Meldrum | Trustee | 12 March 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £482.85k | £446.75k | £410.62k | £350.39k | £425.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £373.41k | £425.21k | £440.10k | £259.02k | £346.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £217.00k | £198.98k | £130.00k | £150.00k | £156.37k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 09 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 15 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 03 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 03 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 03 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 29/10/1984 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22/06/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/04/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 12 SEP 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18 OCT 2017 as amended on 20 Nov 2020 as amended on 16 Dec 2021 as amended on 16 Dec 2021 as amended on 14 Mar 2025
Charitable objects
i. to promote the benefit of the inhabitants of the London Boroughs of Camden, Islington and Haringey and the City of London with particular emphasis on those living within walking distance of the Community Centre at 25 Bertram Street London NW5 (hereinafter called 'the Area of Benefit') without distinction of sex, or of political, religious or other opinions by associating the local authorities, voluntary organisations and inhabitants in a common effort to advance education and provide facilities in the interest of social welfare for recreation and leisure time occupations with the object of improving the conditions of life of said inhabitants and promoting community cohesion within the Area of Benefit and its surroundings ii. To establish or secure the establishment of a Community Centre (hereinafter called ‘the Centre’) anywhere within the area of benefit, and to maintain and manage, or to co-operate with any local statutory authority in the maintenance and management of such a centre for activities promoted by the Association and its constituent bodies in furtherance of the above objects.
Area of benefit
HIGHGATE WARD AREA OF THE LONDON BOROUGH OF CAMDEN
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 HIGHGATE CLOSE
LONDON
N6 4SD
- Phone:
- 02083483775
- Email:
- andrew.s@hncc.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window