Financial history GROUP FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF PSYCHODYNAMICS AND PSYCHOTHERAPY IN SOCIAL WORK

Charity number: 290726
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £146.06k £81.75k £70.48k £76.67k £83.97k
Total expenditure £53.84k £65.34k £87.53k £84.83k £91.71k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A