Accounts and annual returns JOHN PERCY DUDIN WILL TRUST

Charity number: 290727
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 26 June 2024 10 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 26 June 2024 Not Required
Annual return 26 June 2023 26 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 26 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 26 June 2022 23 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 26 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 26 June 2021 09 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 26 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 26 June 2020 27 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 26 June 2020 Not Required