Accounts and annual returns THE MATCH LABEL TRUST

Charity Number: 290734
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 January 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2011 Not submitted
Annual return 01 January 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 01 January 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 01 January 2008 22 July 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2008 Not Required