HELPING HAND FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO MAKE GRANTS OF MONEY TO ANY INDIVIDUAL, HOSPTIAL, CLINIC OR WELFARE CENTRE FOR THE PURPOSE OF PURCHASING MEDICAL EQUIPMENT, MEDICAL FURNITURE, SPECIALISED MEDICAL TREATMENT, EQUIPMENT FOR PHYSIOTHERAPEUTIC PURPOSES AND VEHICLES FOR THE CONVEYANCE OF SICK OR HANDICAPPED PERSONS (INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO WHEELCHAIRS AND AMBULANCES).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 06 September 2022
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Knowsley
- Lancashire
- Liverpool City
- Sefton
- St Helens
- Warrington
- Wirral
Governance
- 23 April 1985: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEPHEN MCGRAVIE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Roy Underwood | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Kay Maddison | Trustee | 10 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
JOHN MCGRAVIE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MICHELLE ANNE KELLY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 06/09/2018 | 06/09/2019 | 06/09/2020 | 06/09/2021 | 06/09/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.97k | £1.44k | £846 | £497 | £288 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.00k | £6.25k | £4.23k | £0 | £1.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 06 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 306 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 306 days | |
Annual return | 06 September 2022 | 06 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 06 September 2021 | 19 July 2022 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 06 September 2020 | 18 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 06 September 2019 | 18 June 2021 | 347 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 1ST OCTOBER 1984
Charitable objects
1. TO MAKE GRANTS OF MONEY TO ANY HOSPITAL, CLINIC OR WELFARE CENTRE FOR THE PURPOSE OF PUCHASING MEDICAL EQUIPMENT, MEDICAL FURNITURE, EQUIPMENT FOR PHYSIOTHERAPEUTIC PURPOSES AND VEHICLES FOR THE CONVEYANCE OF SIC OR HANDICAPPED PERSONS (INCLUDING BUT NO LIMITED TO WHEELCHAIRS, AMBULANCES AND SITTING CARS). 2. TO MAKE GRANTS OF MONEY FOR THE PURPOSE OF ENABLING SICK OR HANDICAPPED PERSON TO TRAVEL OUTSIDE ANYWHERE FOR SUCH SPECIALISED MEDICAL TREATMENT A THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR DISCREATION THINK NECESSARY OR DESIRABLE FOR THE WELFARE OF SUCH SICK OR HANDICAPPED PERSONS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Jaguar Land Rover
Halewood
LIVERPOOL
L24 9BJ
- Phone:
- 01514484429
- Email:
- kmaddiso@jaguarlandrover.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window