Trustees MAIDSTONE GRAMMAR SCHOOL PARENTS' ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 290750

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Anne Hudson | Chair | 20 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
Deyana Popova | Trustee | 21 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alison Jane Stevens | Trustee | 17 October 2022 |
|
|||||
Irene Santineer | Trustee | 17 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Batchelor | Trustee | 15 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mark Tomkins | Trustee | 19 October 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.