Financial history THE DUCKLINGS TRUST

Charity number: 290757
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £23.16k £9.26k £15.04k £7.99k £3.34k
Total expenditure £9.55k £5.88k £1.27k £975 £3.96k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A