Financial history BRITISH CACTUS AND SUCCULENT SOCIETY

Charity number: 290786
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £107.78k £112.29k £118.03k £127.90k £160.73k
Total expenditure £104.71k £172.18k £176.49k £119.25k £142.28k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A