BRITISH CACTUS AND SUCCULENT SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To educate the general public about cacti and other succulents, provide services to our members including publications and assist in the conservation of the plants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 03 January 1985: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ian David Armstrong | Trustee | 27 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peter Bint | Trustee | 15 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ruth James | Trustee | 30 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Maddock | Trustee | 30 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD CHANTLER | Trustee | 01 December 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £107.78k | £112.29k | £118.03k | £127.90k | £160.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £104.71k | £172.18k | £176.49k | £119.25k | £142.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 04 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 04 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 25 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 25 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 02 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 02 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 04 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 04 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES DATED 16TH APRIL 1983 AS AMENDED ON 3RD OCTOBER 1984 AND APRIL 2009. as amended on 11 Apr 2015
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY STUDY, CULTURE AND PROPAGATION OF CACTI AND OTHER SUCCULENT PLANTS AND TO PROMOTE THE CONSERVATION OF SUCH PLANTS. IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE GENERAL OBJECTS BUT NOT FURTHER OR OTHERWISE THE SOCIETY MAY (A) GATHER AND DISSEMINATE PARTICULARS OF CULTIVATION AND PROPAGATION, (B) HOLD MEETINGS, SHOWS, LECTURES, EXHIBITIONS, VISITS TO COLLECTIONS, EXCHANGE PLANTS, SEEDS AND STUDY MATERIALS, PUBLISH JOURNALS, BOOKS, MANUALS AND OTHER MATERIALS AND SUCH OTHER ACTIVITIES AS MAY PROMOTE THE OBJECTS, (C) RAISE FUNDS AND INVITE AND RECEIVE CONTRIBUTIONS FROM ANY PERSON OR PERSONS WHATEVER BY WAY OF SUBSCRIPTIONS, PUBLICATION OF BOOKS, MANUALS AND OTHER MATERIALS AND OTHER MATERIALS AND OTHERWISE PROVIDED THAT THE SOCIETY SHALL NOT UNDERTAKE ANY PERMANENT TRADING ACTIVITES IN RAISING FUNDS FOR ITS PRIMARY CHARITABLE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Boot Farm
Watchet Lane
Great Missenden
HP16 0DR
- Phone:
- 01522790969
- Email:
- secretary@bcss.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window