Financial history THE LONDON MOZART PLAYERS TRUST

Charity number: 290833
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £432.57k £376.61k £380.13k £470.39k £961.63k
Total expenditure £479.23k £511.52k £499.25k £540.29k £987.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £34.01k £98.67k £41.47k £38.03k £78.92k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £312.71k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £497.10k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £8.72k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £143.10k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £9.39k
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £987.43k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £3.20k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £105.54k
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0