CITY EDUCATIONAL TRUST FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO ADVANCE THE OBJECTS OF THE CITY UNIVERSITY OR ANY SUCH OBJECTS FOR EDUCATIONAL PURPOSES CONNECTED WITH OR RELATED TO SAID UNIVERSITY, AND TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, BUSINESS MANAGEMENT AND COMMERCE BY PROMOTING RESEARCH STUDY TEACHING AND TRAINING IN BIOLOGY, ECOLOGY OR THE ADVANCEMENT OF RESEARCH AND TEACHING OF THE CULTURAL ARTS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout London
Governance
- 18 February 1985: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CITY OF LONDON | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £142.59k | £156.06k | £205.96k | £70.55k | £139.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £87.14k | £2.02k | £8.43k | £78.99k | £683.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 06 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SECTION 25 OF CITY OF LONDON (VARIOUS POWERS) ACT 1967
Charitable objects
(1) FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE OBJECTS OF THE CITY UNIVERSITY CONSTITUTED BY ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED ON 23RD MAY 1966 CONNECTED WITK, OR RELATED TO THE SAID UNIVERSITY.(2) WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING PARAGRAPH, FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, BUSINESS MANAGEMENT AND COMMERCE BY THE PROMOTION OF RESEARCH, STUDY, TEACHING AND TRAINING IN AND OF SUCH SUBJECTS, OR ANY OF THEM, OR WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING, FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE STUDY AND TEACHING OF BIOLOGY AND ECOLOGY IN AND OR THE CULTURAL ARTS.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE IN THE CATCHMENT AREA OF THE COLLEGE
Contact information
- Address:
-
CITY OF LONDON CORPORATION
PO BOX 270
GUILDHALL
LONDON
EC2P 2EJ
- Phone:
- 02073321917
- Email:
- Grants@cityoflondon.gov.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window