THE TRURO SCHOOL FORMER PUPILS' ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To further the interests of Truro School, its pupils and former pupils.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Cornwall
Governance
- 08 January 1984: Standard registration
- TRURO SCHOOL OLD BOYS' ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RACHEL VAUGHAN | Chair | 24 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
Nancy KENWARD | Trustee | 20 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Mullaly | Trustee | 11 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
GERALD CHEGWIDDEN | Trustee | 13 January 2015 |
|
|||||
JONATHAN NEIL ANGILLEY | Trustee | 25 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM IAN MURDOCH | Trustee |
|
||||||
CHRISTOPHER ROWE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £74 | £0 | £17 | £385 | £523 | |
|
Total expenditure | £50.19k | £509 | £500 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 21 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 February 2023 | 94 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19TH MARCH 1984 AS AMENDED 27 MARCH 2000, AS AMENDED ON 24TH MARCH 2003
Charitable objects
BY SUCH MEANS AS ARE CHARITABLE TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN THE DISTRICT OF TRURO IN THE COUNTY OF CORNWALL AND IN PARTICULAR TO APPLY FUNDS FOR ANY OR ALL OF SUCH OF THE FOLLOWING PURPOSES AS MAY BE CHARITABLE NAMELY FOR THE MAINTENANCE AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE FABRIC EQUIPMENT AND FACILITIES OF THE SCHOOL KNOWN AS TRURO SCHOOL AND WELFARE AND BENEFIT OF ITS PAST AND PRESENT PUPILS AND THE PROMOTION, SUBSISTENCE AND SUPPORT OF EDUCATIONAL, CULTURAL, ATHLETIC AND SPORTING ACTIVITIES WITHIN OR CONNECTED WITH THE SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
TRURO, CORNWALL
Contact information
- Address:
-
TRURO SCHOOL
TRENNICK LANE
TRURO
TR1 1TH
- Phone:
- 01872272763
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window