LHASA LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity promotes public education through the development and use of computer-aided reasoning and information systems in chemistry and the chemistry-related sciences.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£18,704,076
Donations and legacies | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £18.14m | |
Other trading activities | £94.27k | |
Investments | £468.45k | |
Other | £3.15k |
Total expenditure:
£16,247,432
Raising funds | £81.48k | |
Charitable activities | £16.17m | |
Other | £0 |
£612,581 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £81.48k | |
Charitable expenditure | £16.17m | |
Retained for future use | £2.46m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £81.48k | |
Charitable expenditure | £16.17m | |
Retained for future use | £3.07m |
People

168 Employee(s)
10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 27 |
£70k to £80k | 21 |
£80k to £90k | 12 |
£90k to £100k | 6 |
£100k to £110k | 1 |
£110k to £120k | 1 |
£200k to £250k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Leeds City
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- Poland
- United States
Governance
- 18 January 1985: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Marsland | Chair | 11 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Stuart James Clarke | Trustee | 13 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tanja Carol Lichtensteiger | Trustee | 13 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
David John Rawson | Trustee | 14 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Marcus Lee Mills | Trustee | 22 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Steve Gutsell | Trustee | 16 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Duncan Craig Ratcliffe | Trustee | 10 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Richard John Brennan | Trustee | 13 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
DR James Harvey | Trustee | 14 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr Krista Dobo | Trustee | 14 June 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.09m | £14.04m | £15.69m | £16.98m | £18.70m | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.32m | £10.41m | £13.85m | £14.26m | £16.25m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £94.27k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £12.94m | £13.92m | £15.53m | £16.72m | £18.14m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £145.00k | £109.58k | £152.56k | £267.18k | £468.45k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £10.45k | £10.57k | £834 | £3.15k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £10.30m | £10.38m | £13.76m | £14.19m | £16.17m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £22.00k | £29.32k | £89.55k | £71.36k | £81.48k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £45.00k | £48.02k | £45.97k | £61.75k | £79.68k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £31.00k | £86.60k | £95 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £22.00k | £29.32k | £89.55k | £71.36k | £81.48k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £5.46m | £6.38m | £6.62m | £7.16m | £7.77m | |
|
Long-term investments | £3.99m | £7.62m | £9.92m | £9.34m | £10.30m | |
|
Other assets | £11.93m | £11.76m | £13.78m | £16.11m | £15.75m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£1.29m | -£1.15m | -£2.31m | -£2.14m | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £7.48m | £7.93m | £8.67m | £9.84m | £10.12m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 13 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 22 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 02 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 02 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 27/10/1983 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/08/1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05/09/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01/06/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/06/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09/06/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12/06/2013
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE PUBLIC EDUCATION THROUGH THE DEVELOPMENT AND USE OF COMPUTER AIDED REASONING AND INFORMATION SYSTEMS IN CHEMISTRY AND THE CHEMISTRY RELATED SCIENCES. (B) TO PROVIDE TO ITS MEMBERS AND OTHER PERSONS A SERVICE FOR COMPUTER AIDED REASONING AND INFORMATION SYSTEMS IN CHEMISTRY AND THE CHEMISTRY RELATED SCIENCES, THROUGH THE INSTALLATION AND OPERATION OF COMPUTER FACILITIES. (C) TO PROMOTE AND PROVIDE SERVICES IN THE GENERAL FIELD OF COMPUTER UTILISATION IN CONNECTION WITH CHEMISTRY AND THE CHEMISTRY RELATED SCIENCES. (D) TO ORGANISE CONFERENCES AND OTHER MEETINGS RELATING TO CHEMISTRY AND THE CHEMISTRY RELATED SCIENCES AND TO PUBLISH AND SELL OR OTHERWISE DISTRIBUTE THE REPORTS OF THE PROCEEDINGS OF SUCH CONFERENCES OR MEETINGS. (E) TO PROMOTE AND CARRY OUT RESEARCH AND OTHER WORK IN CONNECTION WITH THE DEVELOPMENT AND USE OF REASONING AND INFORMATION SYSTEMS IN CHEMISTRY AND THE CHEMISTRY RELATED SCIENCES AND FOR THAT PURPOSE TO ESTABLISH, AND EQUIP, MAINTAIN AND SUPPORT SUITABLE LABORATORIES AND PLANT FOR THE CARRYING OUT OF EXPERIMENTS, TESTS AND OTHER ACTIVITIES AS MAY BE DEEMED ADVISABLE, AND TO PROVIDE FUNDS FOR PAYMENT OF ANY PERSON OR PERSONS ENGAGED ON THAT WORK IN LABORATORIES OR ELSEWHERE, AND OF PROFESSIONAL AND TECHNICAL ADVISERS AND TO PUBLISH THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH AND WORK.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Canal Wharf
Holbeck
LEEDS
LS11 5PS
- Phone:
- 01133946069
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window