THE FRIENDS OF BROXBOURNE SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Parent Teacher Association for The Broxbourne School in Hertfordshire
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 21 January 1985: Standard registration
No other names
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Church | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carey Church | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
PETER CLIFT | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Bernice Spray | Trustee | 03 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
KEITH PARRIS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.20k | £629 | £2.34k | £1.93k | £1.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £353 | £4.05k | £372 | £460 | £647 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 20 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 21 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 07 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 19 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 18 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AS AMENDED ON 01/09/1994 AS AMENDED ON 15/03/2011
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE ASSOCIATION ARE TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF THE BROXBOURNE SCHOOL (AND ANY SUCCESSOR EDUCATIONAL INSTITUTION) FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN SUCH WAYS THAT SUPPLEMENT THE FUNDING OF THE SCHOOL AND ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO ENGLISH LAW AND ANCILLARY TO THESE OBJECTS THE ASSOCIATION MAY:(A) FOSTER MORE EXTENDED RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN STAFF PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; AND (B) ENGAGE IN ACTIVITIES THAT SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THOSE ATTENDING IT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Broxbourne School
Badgers Walk
BROXBOURNE
Hertfordshire
EN10 7FU
- Phone:
- 01992411060
- Email:
- fotbs@hotmail.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window