THE ATHENAEUM SINGERS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Amateur Choral Society
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 31 May 1985: Standard registration
- 20 September 2022: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 20 September 2022: Funds transferred to 1195761 THE ATHENAEUM SINGERS
No other names
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2017 | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.70k | £12.49k | £17.65k | £13.26k | £4.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.17k | £10.96k | £10.92k | £11.81k | £8.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 11 August 2020 | 42 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED APRIL 1984 AS AMENDED ON OCTOBER 1984, JANUARY 1991, SEPTEMBER 1992, 3 OCTOBER 2006 AND 9 NOVEMBER 2010. as amended on 23 Feb 2021
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTION, IMPROVEMENT, DEVELOPMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF PUBLIC EDUCATION IN AND APPRECIATION OF THE ART AND SCIENCE OF CHORAL SINGING AND MUSIC GENERALLY BY THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND RECITALS AND IN SUCH OTHER WAYS AS THE CHARITY THROUGH ITS COMMITTEE SHALL DETERMINE FROM TIME TO TIME.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window