Accounts and annual returns THE LAVENDER TRUST

Charity Number: 290935
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2012 10 May 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2012 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2011 10 May 2012 95 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2011 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2010 04 August 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2010 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2009 20 November 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2009 Not Required