Financial history THE BRITISH GYNAECOLOGICAL CANCER SOCIETY

Charity number: 290959
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £334.44k £51.68k £219.00k £317.11k £329.58k
Total expenditure £209.34k £77.23k £131.50k £250.68k £333.42k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A