THE EMSWORTH STROKE CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of persons who have suffered a stroke; by holding regular weekly meetings for members and providing entertainment, therapy (speech, games, art, craft and exercise), social enjoyment, celebratory events, outings and excursions; also holiday vacation assistance and carer relief in special circumstances.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hampshire
- West Sussex
Governance
- 27 February 1985: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GILLIAN KNIGHT | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Jenny Hull | Trustee | 01 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rosie O'Hea | Trustee | 01 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Yvonne Smith | Trustee | 01 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Christine Amey | Trustee | 16 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dorothy Mary Bone BEM | Trustee |
|
||||||
JULIAN SLOTEMA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.19k | £1.07k | £306 | £392 | £1.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.49k | £120 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 02 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 07 January 2024 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 13 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 08 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 28 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1ST NOVEMBER 1984 AS AMENDED 28TH APRIL 1988 AND 8TH JUNE 1989
Charitable objects
FOR THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO HAVE SUFFERED A STROKE AND WHO LIVE WITHIN A SIX MILE RADIUS OF THE TOWN OF EMSWORTH IN HAMPSHIRE.
Area of benefit
A SIX MILE RADIUS OF THE TOWN OF EMSWORTH IN HAMPSHIRE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
28A Park Crescent
EMSWORTH
Hampshire
PO10 7NT
- Phone:
- 01243372450
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window