Accounts and annual returns EUROPEAN SOCIETY OF OPHTHALMIC PLASTIC AND RECONSTRUCTIVE SURGERY (ESOPRS)

Charity number: 291040
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 29 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 29 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 28 January 2025 363 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 28 January 2025 363 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 27 January 2025 727 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 07 March 2023 400 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 07 March 2023 400 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 07 March 2023 765 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required