NORTH PETHERTON COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides facilities for the local community of any age or creed to hold or take part in all indoor learning & activities plus can be hired for meetings & parties. Baby clinic most weeks & national blood service 4 times per yr.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £517 from 1 government contract(s) and £950 from 1 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Somerset
Governance
- 15 February 1985: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Roger Quincey | Trustee | 05 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Liz Rixon | Trustee | 15 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mary Sylvia Adams | Trustee | 27 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rosalynd Mary Jowett | Trustee | 27 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Damian Baker | Trustee | 25 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
William Andrew Jennings | Trustee | 24 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jenny Manners | Trustee | 22 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Louise Dennis | Trustee | 01 January 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £41.78k | £30.46k | £42.81k | £36.34k | £38.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £35.60k | £28.49k | £24.10k | £32.60k | £32.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £517 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £18.71k | £4.67k | £950 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 23 July 2024 | 266 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 17 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 13 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 30TH NOVEMBER 1983 as amended on 01 May 2025
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF NORTH PETHERTON WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINION INCLUDING USE FOR MEETING LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
THE PARISH OF NORTH PETHERTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
North Petherton Community Centre
Fore Street
North Petherton
BRIDGWATER
Somerset
TA6 6QA
- Phone:
- 01278663922
- Email:
- bookings@npcc.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window