Financial history THE BEIS NADVORNE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 291070
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £690.59k £640.33k £597.12k £849.67k £879.16k
Total expenditure £667.49k £663.42k £554.71k £761.55k £841.03k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £550.78k £472.04k £405.66k £679.82k £638.86k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £405.66k £0 £0
Income - Investment £139.81k £168.29k £191.46k £169.85k £240.30k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £553.30k £529.46k £410.33k £665.94k £659.35k
Expenditure - Raising funds £114.20k £133.96k £117.22k £95.61k £181.67k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £20.99k £951 £6.64k £4.52k £1.52k
Expenditure - Investment management £64.67k £59.97k £72.47k £80.77k £181.67k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £27.16k £0 £0