THE GREENWOOD PRE-SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing pre-school care & education for 3-5 year olds in the Wokingham area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £125,467 from 1 government contract(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Wokingham
Governance
- 18 February 1985: Standard registration
- GREENWOOD PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kathryn Owers | Trustee | 22 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Claire Cittern-Jones | Trustee | 22 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Atika Sharma | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Karen Davies | Trustee | 05 March 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £109.23k | £109.96k | £106.74k | £119.67k | £147.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £116.66k | £101.63k | £125.95k | £153.67k | £153.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £107.18k | £107.01k | £100.23k | £104.39k | £125.47k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 15 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 07 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 07 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 22 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 23 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 17 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSION 2 AUGUST 2016
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN BELOW COMPULSORY SCHOOL AGE BY: (A) PROVIDING SAFE AND SATISFYIN GROUP PLAY, IN WHICH PARENTS HAVE THE RIGHT TO TAKE PART. (B) ENCOURAGING OTHER CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES THROUGH WHICH PARENTS MAY HELP CHILDREN. (C) FURTHERING THE AIMS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUPS ASSOCIATION.
Area of benefit
WINNERSH
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O Winnersh Primary School
Greenwood Grove
Winnersh
WOKINGHAM
Berkshire
RG41 5LH
- Phone:
- 01189797580
- Email:
- greenwood@weycp.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window