MADINA MOSQUE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promoting, advancing and maintaining religious activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Hackney
Governance
- 12 June 1985: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Abdul Hai Saccha | Trustee | 16 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
SABBIR BAIYAT | Trustee | 16 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
YUSUF ALI MANGERA | Trustee | 16 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
Adam Varachia | Trustee | 16 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
Ebrahim Patel | Trustee | 16 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMED SULEMAN PIRBHAI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ABDUL RAHMAN PATEL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SABBIR PATEL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
YUSUF HAJAT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £268.61k | £246.52k | £290.86k | £309.80k | £364.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £222.66k | £199.17k | £190.62k | £264.26k | £419.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 17 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 March 2023 | 38 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 10 March 2023 | 38 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 February 2022 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 18 February 2022 | 18 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 February 2021 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 09 February 2021 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25/12/1984 AS AMENDED ON 21/01/1985 AS AMENDED ON 16/10/2011
Charitable objects
(A)TO PROMOTE RELIGION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TENETS AND DOCTRINES OF THE ISLAMIC FAITH, BELONGING TO THE AHL AL-SUNNAH WA I-JAMAA; (B)TO PROMOTE EDUCATION AND TEACHING OF THE ISLAMIC FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE MUSLIM COMMUNITY; (C) TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE MUSLIM COMMUNITY IN HACKNEY AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, AND IN PARTICULAR FOR THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, DISTRESS AND SICKNESS; (D)PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF BENEFIT TO THE MUSLIM INHABITANTS OF THE AREA IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECTS OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
2A LEA BRIDGE ROAD
CLAPTON
LONDON
E5 9QD
- Phone:
- 02089858204
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
WWW.MADINA-MASJID.ORG.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window