SOUTHWELL WOMEN'S INSTITUTE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Southwell WI is on Portland in Dorset, and is part of the Dorset Federation of WI's. We hold evening meetings to enable people who work to have access to the WI. Our activities are varied and include talks, demonstrations and outings.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 28 February 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Dorset
Governance
- 14 February 1985: Standard registration
- 30 April 2009: Removed (Voluntary removal)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 28/02/2007 | 28/02/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £736 | £1.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £612 | £1.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 28 February 2008 | 08 January 2009 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2007 | 01 January 2009 | 370 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2004 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2004 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MODEL CONSTITUTION AND RULES (ALREADY LODGED)
Charitable objects
TO IMPROVE AND DEVELOP CONDITIONS OF RURAL LIFE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE CONSTITUTION AND RULES OF THE WOMEN'S INSTITUTE.
Area of benefit
ISLAND OF PORTLAND
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window